(SS) Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Joann Rodriguez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01489
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Cheung, Allison J. added. (Cheung, Allison)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Joann Rodriguez. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/9/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
October 31, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Joann Rodriguez. (Merritt, Hannalore)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Joann Rodriguez pursuant to order of the court. (Merritt, Hannalore)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM SS Instructions) (Sant Agata, S)
October 31, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *David Allen* *5230 Folsom Blvd.* *Sacramento, CA 95819*. (Sant Agata, S)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/30/2018. Added attorney Hannalore B. Merritt, PHV for Joann Rodriguez. (Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Hellings, J)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Joann Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion)(Allen, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Joann Rodriguez for attorney Hannalore Merritt to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7940813) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Allen, David)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Joann Rodriguez against Commissioner of Social Security by Joann Rodriguez. Attorney Allen, David added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Allison J. Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Rodriguez
Represented By: David Allen
Represented By: Hannalore B. Merritt, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?