Stavrianoudakis et al v. U.S. Department of Fish & Wildlife et al
Plaintiff: Peter Stavrianoudakis, American Falconry Conservancy, Scott Timmons, Katherine Stavrianoudakis and Eric Ariyoshi
Defendant: U.S. Department of Fish & Wildlife, Charlton H. Bonham and Jim Kurth
Case Number: 1:2018cv01505
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference currently set for Tuesday, February 5, 2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/18/2018. (Valdez, E)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/17/18. Added attorney James M. Manley, PHV for American Falconry Conservancy, Eric Ariyoshi, Katherine Stavrianoudakis, Peter Stavrianoudakis, Scott Timmons. (Marrujo, C)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by American Falconry Conservancy, Eric Ariyoshi, Katherine Stavrianoudakis, Peter Stavrianoudakis, Scott Timmons for attorney James M. Manley to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8017859) (Snowball, Timothy)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Timmons, Eric Ariyoshi, American Falconry Conservancy, Peter Stavrianoudakis, Katherine Stavrianoudakis. (Snowball, Timothy)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO JANUARY 28, 2019 by Charlton H. Bonham. Attorney Gandara, Linda Lea added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gandara, Linda)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Scott Timmons, Eric Ariyoshi, American Falconry Conservancy, Peter Stavrianoudakis, Katherine Stavrianoudakis. Jim Kurth served on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019; U.S. Department of Fish & Wildlife served on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Snowball, Timothy)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Charlton H. Bonham served on 11/21/2018, answer due 12/12/2018. (Snowball, Timothy)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *U.S. Department of Fish & Wildlife* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Timothy Ray Snowball* *Pacific Legal Foundation* *930 G Street* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Gonzalez, R)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Charlton H. Bonham, Jim Kurth* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Timothy Ray Snowball* *Pacific Legal Foundation* *930 G Street* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Gonzalez, R)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Snowball, Timothy Ray added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7943168) (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Snowball, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stavrianoudakis et al v. U.S. Department of Fish & Wildlife et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Stavrianoudakis
Represented By: Timothy Ray Snowball
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Represented By: James M. Manley, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Falconry Conservancy
Represented By: Timothy Ray Snowball
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Represented By: James M. Manley, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Timmons
Represented By: Timothy Ray Snowball
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Represented By: James M. Manley, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Stavrianoudakis
Represented By: Timothy Ray Snowball
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Represented By: James M. Manley, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ariyoshi
Represented By: Timothy Ray Snowball
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Represented By: James M. Manley, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Fish & Wildlife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton H. Bonham
Represented By: Linda Lea Gandara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Kurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?