(PC) Jones v. California Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Benjamin Jones
Defendant: J. Zamora, A. Shaw, J. Mendez, C. Mauldin, California Department of Corrections and S. Sherman
Case Number: 1:2018cv01537
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Benjamin Jones. (Hellings, J)
November 21, 2018 RECEIPT number #CAE100040892 $400.00 fbo Benjamin Jones by Benjamin Jones on 11/21/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 16, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: Service by Mail, #6 Order, served on Benjamin Jones. (Gonzalez, R)
November 7, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, served on Benjamin Jones. (Hellings, J)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Application, Without Prejudice #2 ; ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis for a Prisoner, OR Pay Filing Fee Within Thirty (30) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application - blank form)(Hellings, J)
November 7, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order served on Benjamin Jones. (Plummer, M)
November 7, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/10/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Plummer, M)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:18-cv-2876 DMC P) to Fresno (1:18-cv-1537 BAM) signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/06/18. (Plummer, M)
October 31, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Benjamin Jones. (Huang, H)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Huang, H)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Benjamin Jones. (Huang, H)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against California Department of Corrections, C. Mauldin, J. Mendez, A. Shaw, S. Sherman, and J. Zamora by Benjamin Jones.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Jones v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?