(PC) Villery v. Crounse, et al.
Plaintiff: Jared M. Villery
Defendant: Edward Garcia, Alicia Guerrero, Todd Haak and David Crounse
Case Number: 1:2018cv01623
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:18-cv-01623-LJO-SKO. (Marrujo, C)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Jared M. Villery. (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jared M. Villery. (Marrujo, C)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Lundstrom, T)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jared M. Villery. (Lundstrom, T)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on vsp.efile@cdcr.ca.gov. for Jared M. Villery. (Lundstrom, T)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *11/27/2018*; Consent or Decline due by 12/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Lundstrom, T)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jared M. Villery. (Lundstrom, T)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against David Crounse, Edward Garcia, Alicia Guerrero, and Todd Haak by Jared M. Villery. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Villery v. Crounse, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Guerrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Haak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Crounse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared M. Villery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?