(PC) Webster v. Love et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Webster
Defendant: Melody Samulson, Rhonda Love, Natalie Haskins, Pam Ahlin and Dean Percy
Case Number: 1:2018cv01640
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 22 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomas Webster. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 4, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #21 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Thomas Webster. (Sant Agata, S)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion to Proceed IFP as a Non-Prisoner signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/4/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 29, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #20 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Thomas Webster. (Sant Agata, S)
November 29, 2018 Filing 20 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 1/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
November 29, 2018 Filing 19 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:18-cv-01580.
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF TRANSFER. The Court orders this matter be transferred to the Eastern District of California. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Thomas Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #2 Extension of Time to file in forma pauperis application. Deadline 10/23/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/25/2018. (NOTE: 2 copies of IFP Application and copy of order sent to plaintiff by AMK). (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018) Modified text on 9/26/2018 (amkS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
August 30, 2018 Filing 15 Second Declaration of Thomas Webster for entry of default. filed byThomas Webster. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 14 Supplemental re #1 Complaint filed by Thomas Webster. (Related document(s) #1 ) (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 13 Declaration of Thomas Webster in support of entry of default filed byThomas Webster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File amended complaint filed by Thomas Webster. (Attachments: #1 supplemental complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 11 Letter from Thomas Webster dated 4/17/18. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 10 Received Document by Thomas Webster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Denying #8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Thomas Webster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
April 2, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Thomas Webster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 3/26/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/11/2018: #2 Certificate/Proof of Service) (cv, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/23/2018. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Thomas Webster. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Thomas Webster. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pam Ahlin, Natalie Haskins, Rhonda Love, Dean Percy, Melody Samulson (Filing fee: IFPP). Filed by Thomas Webster. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018) [Transferred from cand on 11/29/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Webster v. Love et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Samulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natalie Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Percy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?