(HC) Banks v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Petitioner: Frederick Banks
Respondent: Central Intelligence Agency, U.S. Senate, U.S. House of Representatives, Gina Haspel, Devin Nunes, Maxine Waters, Adam Schiff, Alexandria Acossa Cortez and Ventura County Sheriff's Office
Case Number: 1:2018cv01655
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL STATEMENT by Frederick Banks. (Jessen, A)
January 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, Findings and Recommendations (Order), #6 Judgment served on Frederick Banks. (Flores, E)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dated *01/03/2019* pursuant to order. (Flores, E)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #2 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Frivolous Habeas Petition signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 01/02/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Frederick Banks. (Marrujo, C)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #2 by Petitioner Frederick Banks. (Marrujo, C)
December 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Findings and Recommendations, served on Frederick Banks. (Gonzalez, R)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER to ASSIGN Case to District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Frivolous #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 12/5/18. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Central Intelligence Agency, Alexandria Acossa Cortez, Gina Haspel, Devin Nunes, Adam Schiff, U.S. House of Representatives, U.S. Senate, Ventura County Sheriff's Office, Maxine Waters by Frederick Banks.(Gonzalez, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Banks v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frederick Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Senate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. House of Representatives
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gina Haspel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Devin Nunes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Maxine Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Adam Schiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alexandria Acossa Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ventura County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?