Campos et al v. Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association, County of Fresno et al

Plaintiff: Latana M. Chandavong and Cesar Campos
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Eric Banks, Arthur A. Krantz, Erich Shiners, Priscilla Winslow, Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association, County of Fresno, Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association and County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2018cv01660
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE (Text Only). Counsel are reminded that before the Court may consider admission pro hac vice, they must pay the fee. (Robles, S)
February 1, 2019 Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong for attorney Talcott J. Franklin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Benbrook, Bradley)
January 20, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Eric Banks on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; Arthur A. Krantz on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; Erich Shiners on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; Priscilla Winslow on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019 (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 20, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Xavier Becerra on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019 (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; County of Fresno on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019 (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong for attorney Talcott Franklin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8043657) (Benbrook, Bradley)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/11/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong for attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8007370) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 8, 2018 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD. Correctly filed at #6 *** PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong for attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mitchell, Jonathan F. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8007370) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED, Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Arthur A. Krantz, Erich Shiners, Priscilla Winslow* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley A. Benbrook* *Benbrook Law Group* *400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Gonzalez, R)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association, County of Fresno* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley A. Benbrook* *Benbrook Law Group* *400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Gonzalez, R)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Latana M. Chandavong, Cesar Campos. Attorney Benbrook, Bradley A. added. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-8004063) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benbrook, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campos et al v. Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association, County of Fresno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A. Krantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich Shiners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association, County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latana M. Chandavong
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Campos
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?