Beltran et al v. Olam Spices and Vegetables, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mario Martinez, Mariana Ramirez, Alexander Solorio, Juan Rivera, Thomas Beltran and Maria Claudia Obesto Cota
Defendant: Olam Spices and Vegetables, Inc. and Olam West Coast
Case Number: 1:2018cv01676
Filed: December 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuing Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Olam Spices and Vegetables, Inc.. (Hatmaker, Susan)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Olam Spices and Vegetables, Inc.. (Hatmaker, Susan)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 SAB Sch Conf, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Olam Spices and Vegetables, Inc.. (Hatmaker, Susan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Olam Spices and Vegetables, Inc. (Hatmaker, Susan)
December 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 15CECG02993 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8008099) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 - 25 (State Court Documents), #2 Exhibit Exhibits 26 - 50 (State Court Documents), #3 Exhibit Exhibits 51 - 67 (State Court Documents), #4 Exhibit Exhibits 68 - 73 (State Court Documents), #5 Exhibit Exhibits 74 (State Court Documents), #6 Exhibit Exhibits 75 - 79 (State Court Documents), #7 Exhibit Exhibits 80 (State Court Documents), #8 Exhibit Exhibits 81 - 83 (State Court Documents), #9 Exhibit Exhibits 84 - 85 (State Court Documents), #10 Exhibit Exhibits 86 (State Court Documents), #11 Exhibit Exhibits 87 - 105 (State Court Documents), #12 Exhibit Exhibits 106 - 116 (State Court Documents), #13 Exhibit Exhibits 117 - 131 (State Court Documents), #14 Exhibit Exhibits 132 - 139 (State Court Documents), #15 Exhibit Exhibits 140 - 146 (State Court Documents), #16 Exhibit Exhibits 147 (State Court Documents), #17 Exhibit Exhibits 148 - 154 (State Court Documents), #18 Exhibit Exhibits 155 (State Court Documents), #19 Exhibit Exhibits 156 - 160 (State Court Documents))(Hatmaker, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran et al v. Olam Spices and Vegetables, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Martinez
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mariana Ramirez
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Solorio
Represented By: Joseph Lavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Rivera
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Beltran
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Claudia Obesto Cota
Represented By: Joseph Lavi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olam Spices and Vegetables, Inc.
Represented By: Susan K. Hatmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olam West Coast
Represented By: Susan K. Hatmaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?