Carlos Gonzalez vs Clean Harbors, Inc.

Plaintiff: Carlos Gonzalez
Defendant: Clean Harbors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01727
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Neil Gehlawat on behalf of Carlos Gonzalez. Attorney Gehlawat, Neil added. (Gehlawat, Neil)
January 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Scott A. Adrian NCAED. (Lundstrom, T)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER discharging #5 Order to Show Cause signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/23/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
January 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Clerk's Notice served on Scott A. Adrian NCAED. (Hellings, J)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE directing Attorney Scott A. Adrian, NCAED to submit Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Hellings, J)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Clean Harbors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Baravarian, Tina)
January 3, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order to Show Cause served on Scott A. Adrian NCAED. (Hellings, J)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/2/2019: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tina L. Baravarian on behalf of Clean Harbors, Inc.. (Baravarian, Tina)
December 20, 2018 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8029031. (Baravarian, Tina)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Clean Harbors, Inc.. (Baravarian, Tina)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California For the County of Kern-Bakersfield, case number BCV-18-102858 by Clean Harbors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baravarian, Tina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlos Gonzalez vs Clean Harbors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors, Inc.
Represented By: Tina L. Baravarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Gonzalez
Represented By: Scott A. Adrian, NCAED
Represented By: Scott Alexander Adrian
Represented By: Neil Gehlawat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?