(PC) Lugo v. Fisher, et al.
Plaintiff: Keith Robert Lugo
Defendant: L. Mayfield, Caitlan, Angelina and R. Fisher
Case Number: 1:2019cv00039
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to Either File Amended Complaint or Notify Court that he is Willing to Proceed on Cognizable Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/01/2019. Amended Complaint due by 4/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Flores, E)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #19 Screening Order served on Keith Robert Lugo. (Flores, E)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Adopting #15 Findings and Recommendation, and Denying Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Court Order to Prevent his Transfer, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/21/19. (Gonzalez, R)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on Keith Robert Lugo. (Gonzalez, R)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #15 by Plaintiff Keith Robert Lugo. (Gonzalez, R)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #15 by Plaintiff Keith Robert Lugo. (Gonzalez, R)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign a District Judge to this Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's #14 Motion for Court Order to Prevent his Transfer, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/11/19. This case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The New Case No. is: 1:19-cv-0039-LJO-SAB. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. Referred to Judge O'Neill. (Gonzalez, R)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Findings and Recommendations, served on Keith Robert Lugo. (Gonzalez, R)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Order the Department of Corrections for the State of California to NOT Transfer and Order that Remain Detained at VSP by Keith Robert Lugo. (Sant Agata, S)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Keith Robert Lugo. (Flores, E)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Keith Robert Lugo. (Flores, E)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Keith Robert Lugo. (Gonzalez, R)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SUBMIT Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis for a Prisoner, or PAY Filing Fee within Forty-Five (45) Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order, served on Keith Robert Lugo. (Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Hellings, J)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:18-cv-07349.
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Complaint, #9 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Keith Robert Lugo. (Hellings, J)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/4/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (pmcS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 1/9/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keith Robert Lugo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2018) [Transferred from cand on 1/9/2019.]
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Prisoner's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and a signed Certificate of Funds in Prisoner's Account filed by Keith Robert Lugo. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2018) [Transferred from cand on 1/9/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/14/2019. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 1/9/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 1/9/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keith Robert Lugo. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 1/9/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Angelina, Caitlan, R. Fisher, L. Mayfield. Filed byKeith Robert Lugo. Consent/Declination due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 1/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lugo v. Fisher, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Robert Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caitlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angelina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?