(PC) Vazquez v. Conannan et al

Plaintiff: Juan R. Vazquez
Defendant: E. Conannan, N. Sigrist, J. Silveira, M Vanblargon, I. Mathos, G. Kamon and S. Hitchman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00045
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Screening Order, served on Juan R. Vazquez. (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SECOND SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint or Notify the Court of Intent to Proceed Upon Claim Found to be Cognizable, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/19. Second Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Gonzalez, R)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Juan R. Vazquez.(Sant Agata, S)
February 12, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Refused, Unable to Forward: 11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, sent to Juan R. Vazquez. Notice of Change of Address due by 4/22/2019. (Flores, E)
January 22, 2019 Filing 12 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Juan R. Vazquez. (Jessen, A)
January 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Juan R. Vazquez. (Gonzalez, R)
January 17, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-0045-DAD-SAB. (Gonzalez, R)
January 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Screening Order served on Juan R. Vazquez. (Gonzalez, R)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER Granting Plaintiff Leave to File Amended Complaint re #1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/16/19. First Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Gonzalez, R)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Juan R. Vazquez. (Gonzalez, R)
January 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Juan R. Vazquez. (Gonzalez, R)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Motion for IFP) (Gonzalez, R)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Juan R. Vazquez. (Gonzalez, R)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Juan R. Vazquez, CDC AX-4771 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Gonzalez, R)
January 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and #5 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Juan R. Vazquez. (Henshaw, R)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *1/8/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Henshaw, R)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-0056 DB) to Fresno (1:19-cv-0045 SAB) signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/9/2019. (Henshaw, R)
January 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Juan R. Vazquez. (Coll, A)
January 8, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *1/8/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 2/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Coll, A)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Juan R. Vazquez. (Coll, A)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Juan R. Vazquez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Vazquez v. Conannan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Conannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Sigrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Silveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Vanblargon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Mathos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Kamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Hitchman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan R. Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?