(HC) Smith v. Superior Court State of California

Petitioner: Cleveland James Smith, Jr.
Respondent: Superior Court State of California
Case Number: 1:2019cv00047
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
0 Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
1 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations,, Findings and Recommendations (Order), #9 Judgment served on Cleveland James Smith Jr. (Gonzalez, R)
February 20, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Unable to Forward: #8 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #9 Judgment sent to Cleveland James Smith, Jr.(Lundstrom, T)
February 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, Findings and Recommendations (Order), #9 Judgment served on Cleveland James Smith Jr. (Hellings, J)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT dated *2/12/2019* pursuant to order signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/12/2019. (Hellings, J)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS #4 ; ORDER DISMISSING Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Enter Judgment and CLOSE Case; ORDER DECLINING to Issue Certificate of Appealability, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/12/2019. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 1636 East 1020 Brown Palace Road, Fresno, CA 93722, by Cleveland James Smith, Jr. (Hellings, J)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cleveland James Smith, Jr. (Hellings, J)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTIONS to #4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Petitioner Cleveland James Smith, Jr. (Flores, E)
January 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Cleveland James Smith Jr.(Hellings, J)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge - CASE ASSIGNED to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. New Case No. 1:19-cv-00047 LJO JLT (HC); FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss Premature Petition #1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/16/2019: 21-Day Objection Deadline. (Hellings, J)
January 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Cleveland James Smith Jr. (Hellings, J)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Cleveland James Smith, Jr., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/0/2019. (Hellings, J)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Hellings, J)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Superior Court State of California by Cleveland James Smith, Jr.(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Smith v. Superior Court State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cleveland James Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superior Court State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?