(HC) Curley John Broussard v. Warden

Petitioner: Curley John Broussard, Jr.
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00051
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
0 Judge: Anthony W Ishii
1 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, #11 Judgment served on Curley John Broussard Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JUDGMENT dated *3/11/2019* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/11/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting #7 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; dismissing Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; directing Clerk of Court to enter Judgment and close case; declining to issue a Certificate of Appealability signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/11/2019. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Curley John Broussard, Jr. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #7 by Petitioner Curley John Broussard, Jr. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Findings and Recommendations served on Curley John Broussard Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to dismiss successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; ORDER directing Clerk of Court to assign District Judge; Case assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/16/2019. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Objections to F&R's due within 21-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
January 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #6 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Curley John Broussard Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Curley John Broussard, Jr. signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/11/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-10350.
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SEVERING AND TRANSFERRING TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA GROUNDS OF PETITION DIRECTED AT 2010 CONVICTION AND SENTENCE IN KINGS COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT by Judge R. Gary Klausner. IT IS ORDERED that the allegations of the Petition directed at the 2010 Kings County conviction are severed and transferred to the Eastern District of California. (see order for details) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 1/11/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111) (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 1/11/2019.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254). Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Filing fee $ 5 Due), filed by Petitioner Curley John Broussard, Jr. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 1/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Curley John Broussard v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Curley John Broussard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?