(PC) Giscome v. Redman et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Giscome
Defendant: G. Jaime, T. Redman and C. Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2019cv00064
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Screening Order, served on Timothy Giscome. (Flores, E)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCREENING ORDER; ORDER that Plaintiff File a Second Amended Complaint or Notify the Court that he Wishes to Stand on his Complaint, Subject to the Court Issuing Findings and Recommendations to a District Judge Consistent with this Court signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 03/08/2019. Thirty-Day Deadline. #1 Amended Complaint Form) (Flores, E).
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Timothy Giscome. (Jessen, A)
January 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Timothy Giscome. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 1/17/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP APPLICATION) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Timothy Giscome (Martin-Gill, S)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: New Case Documents served on Kern Valley State Prison. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *1/15/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Timothy Giscome, CDC P-43447 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Timothy Giscome. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against C. Gonzalez, G. Jaime, T. Redman by Timothy Giscome.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Giscome v. Redman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Jaime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Redman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Giscome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?