(HC) Acedo v. Gastello

Petitioner: Daniel Acedo
Respondent: Josie Gastello
Case Number: 1:2019cv00070
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Supplement (Not to Amend) by Daniel Acedo. (Sant Agata, S)
February 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Daniel Acedo. (Hellings, J)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00070 DAD SKO (HC). (Hellings, J)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Josie Gastello. Attorney Chan, Maria G. added. (Chan, Maria)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Daniel Acedo. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Daniel Acedo. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, served on Tami Krezin, Attorney General. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/25/2019. Defendant's Consent or Decline due by 3/28/2019. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 01/25/2019. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General.(Flores, E)
January 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Transfer Order, #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Daniel Acedo. (Lundstrom, T)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Daniel Acedo signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/16/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-00172.
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (sbou) [Transferred from cacd on 1/16/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254), filed by Petitioner Daniel Acedo. Case assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3) (jtil) [Transferred from cacd on 1/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Acedo v. Gastello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josie Gastello
Represented By: Maria G. Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Acedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?