Perkins v. City of Modesto et al
Plaintiff: Jason B. Perkins
Defendant: Jerry J. Ramar, Galen L. Carroll, City of Modesto and Modesto Police Department
Case Number: 1:2019cv00126
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Galen L. Carroll, City of Modesto, Modesto Police Department, Jerry J. Ramar.(Allen, Dale)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Galen L. Carroll, City of Modesto, Modesto Police Department, Jerry J. Ramar. Attorney Allen, Dale Long added.(Allen, Dale)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Jerry J. Ramar served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Merin, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Galen L. Carroll served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Merin, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Modesto Police Department served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Merin, Mark)
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Modesto served on 1/31/2019, answer due 2/21/2019. (Merin, Mark)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jerry J. Ramar* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *Law Office of Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Jessen, A)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Modesto Police Department* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *Law Office of Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Jessen, A)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *City of Modesto* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *Law Office of Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Jessen, A)
January 30, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Galen L. Carroll* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Mark E. Merin* *Law Office of Mark E. Merin* *1010 F Street, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Jessen, A)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Galen L. Carroll, City of Modesto, Modesto Police Department, Jerry J. Ramar by Jason B. Perkins. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8084175) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merin, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perkins v. City of Modesto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry J. Ramar
Represented By: Dale Long Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galen L. Carroll
Represented By: Dale Long Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Modesto
Represented By: Dale Long Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modesto Police Department
Represented By: Dale Long Allen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason B. Perkins
Represented By: Mark E. Merin
Represented By: Paul Hajime Masuhara, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?