(PC) Washington v. Hicks, et al.
Plaintiff: Tracye Benard Washington
Defendant: Hipolito Rocha and David Hicks
Case Number: 1:2019cv00156
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Vacating #8 Findings and Recommendations Entered on February 13, 2019; ORDER Denying as Moot #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/12/19. (Gonzalez, R)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order, served on Tracye Benard Washington. (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE re Filing Fees Paid in Full, by Tracye Benard Washington (Gonzalez, R)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100041884 $400.00 fbo Tracye Benard WashingtonT81075 by State of California on 3/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tracye Benard Washington. (Flores, E)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VACATED BY ORDER 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Be Denied signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 02/12/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/4/2019. (Flores, E)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Tracye Benard Washington. (Flores, E)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-156 LJO-GSA PC. (Flores, E)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Tracye Benard Washington. (Flores, E)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Tracye Benard Washington. (Lundstrom, T)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Filings.KVSP@cdcr.ca.gov. for Tracye Benard Washington. (Lundstrom, T)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *2/5/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 3/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Lundstrom, T)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Tracye Benard Washington, CDC T-81075 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Lundstrom, T)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Tracye Benard Washington. (Lundstrom, T)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against David Hicks and Hipolito Rocha by Tracye Benard Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Washington v. Hicks, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hipolito Rocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracye Benard Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?