(SS)Clark v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Casey L. Clark
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00196
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Marriott, Michael K. added. (Marriott, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Casey L. Clark. (Cho, Young)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Casey L. Clark. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cho, Young)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM-285 Forms) (Flores, E)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Young Chul Cho* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 E. Imperial Hwy., Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Flores, E)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 02/13/2019. (Flores, E)
February 12, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Marrujo, C)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Casey L. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cho, Young)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Commissioner of Social Security by Casey L. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Interested Parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cho, Young)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS)Clark v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey L. Clark
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?