Bland v. CSPC Warden

Plaintiff: Joshua Davis Bland
Defendant: CSPC Warden
Case Number: 1:2019cv00219
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Jessen, A)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ADOPTING #4 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; ORDER REMANDING CASE to Kings County Superior Court for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; and ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Action signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/10/2019. CASE CLOSED. Copy of remand order mailed to Kings County Superior Court, 1640 Kings County Drive, Hanford, CA 93230. (Jessen, A)
March 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Findings and Recommendations (Motion) served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Flores, E)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Remanding Action to State Court signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 03/01/2019. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 3/18/2019. (Flores, E)
February 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Joshua Davis Bland. (Gonzalez, R)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Vacating #2 Civil New Case Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/15/19. (Gonzalez, R)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 Informational Order) (Gonzalez, R)
February 14, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE200096096 $400.00 fbo CSPC Warden by State of California on 2/14/2019. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kings County Superior Court, case number 18C-0356 by CSPC Warden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hennes, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bland v. CSPC Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Davis Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSPC Warden
Represented By: Lucas L. Hennes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?