(SS) Alvarez-Herrera v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Nicole G. Alvarez-Herrera
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00243
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Marriott, Michael K. added. (Marriott, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Nicole G. Alvarez-Herrera. (Newel, Melissa)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Nicole G. Alvarez-Herrera. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/27/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (Newel, Melissa)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melissa Newel* *Newel Law* *2625 Alcatraz Ave., #132* *Berkeley, CA 94705*. (Lundstrom, T)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions). (Lundstrom, T)
February 20, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Nicole G. Alvarez-Herrera. (Newel, Melissa)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Nicole G. Alvarez-Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Newel, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Alvarez-Herrera v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole G. Alvarez-Herrera
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?