(SS) Khachi v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Anabel Khachi
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00257
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Anabel Khachi. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Hellings, J)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Naicker, Tina added. (Naicker, Tina)
March 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Anabel Khachi pursuant to order of the court. (Gonzalez, R)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Notice of Submitting Service Documents to USM: Documents were submitted incorrectly and need to be re-submitted. (Sant Agata, S)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Anabel Khachi. (Lott, Shellie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Anabel Khachi pursuant to order of the court. (Lott, Shellie)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 SS USM Forms) (Sant Agata, S)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Shellie Lott* *42 N. Sutter Street* *Suite 400* *Stockton, CA 95202*. (Sant Agata, S)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/25/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 22, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Anabel Khachi. (Lott, Shellie)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Anabel Khachi. Attorney Lott, Shellie added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lott, Shellie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Khachi v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anabel Khachi
Represented By: Shellie Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?