(SS) Ortega v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Raul Ortega
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00259
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Gonzalez, R)
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Clark, Carol Sue added. (Clark, Carol)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Raul Ortega pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Raul Ortega. (Pena, Jonathan)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 5/31/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM-285 Forms) (Flores, E)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Raul Ortega* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Flores, E)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/25/2019. (Flores, E)
February 22, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Jessen, A)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Raul Hernandez Ortega. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion)(Pena, Jonathan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Raul Hernandez Ortega. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Ortega v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Ortega
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carol Sue Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?