(SS) Valencia v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Cindy Lee Valencia
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00295
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Illarmo, Marcelo N. added. (Illarmo, Marcelo)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cindy Lee Valencia. (Newel, Melissa)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Cindy Lee Valencia. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/6/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Newel, Melissa)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 6/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Forms & Instructions) (Gonzalez, R)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melissa Newel* *Newel Law* *2625 Alcatraz Ave. #132* *Berkeley, CA 94705*. (Gonzalez, R)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/5/19. (Gonzalez, R)
March 4, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Hellings, J)
March 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cindy Lee Valencia. (Newel, Melissa)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Cindy Lee Valencia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Newel, Melissa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Valencia v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Marcelo N. Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Lee Valencia
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?