(PC) Brown v. Chothia et al
Plaintiff: Eugene C. Brown
Defendant: C. Jukes, M. Crutchfield, A. Shaw, C. Patillo, J. Walker, L. Kempe, M. Gilmore, M. Londono, C. Chothia, H.B. Anglea, D. Artis and K.Z. Allen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00352
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *K.Z. Allen, D. Artis, C. Chothia, M. Crutchfield, M. Gilmore, C. Jukes, L. Kempe, M. Londono, C. Patillo, A. Shaw, J. Walker* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Eugene C. Brown k-13547* *SIERRA CONSERVATION CENTER* *5150 O BYRNES FERRY ROAD* *JAMESTOWN, CA 95327*. (Gonzalez, R)
July 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Findings and Recommendations, served on Eugene C. Brown. (Gonzalez, R)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that all Claims be Dismissed Except For Plaintiffs Claims Against Defendants C. Chothia, A. Shaw, L. Kempe, C. Jukes, M. Gilmore, J. Walker, M. Crutchfield, K.Z. Allen, D. Artis, And C. Patillo For Deliberate Indifference To Serious Risk Of Harm In Violation Of The Eighth Amendment; And His Claims Against Defendants C. Jukes, M. Londono, And M. Crutchfield For Retaliation In Violation Of The First Amendment re #1 , #10 , #11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/19. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
July 12, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order Finding Service of Complaint Appropriate, served on Eugene C. Brown. (Gonzalez, R)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FINDING SERVICE OF COMPLAINT APPROPRIATE AND DIRECTING E-SERVICE on the following defendant(s): *C. Chothia*, *A. Shaw*,*L. Kempe*,*C. Jukes*, *M. Gilmore*, *J. Walker*,*M. Crutchfield*,*K.Z. Allen* *D. Artis*, *C. Patillo*,*M. Londono*,. Operative Complaint, Summons, Notice of E-Service Waiver and this Order served via email on CDCR. signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Eugene C. Brown. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00352-DAD-EPG. (Gonzalez, R)
July 11, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Minute Order served on Eugene C. Brown. (Rooney, M)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Clerk's Office is directed to randomly assign a Fresno District Judge to this matter. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/11/2019. (Rooney, M)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Eugene C. Brown to #10 Screening Order. (Gonzalez, R)
June 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Screening Order served on Eugene C. Brown. (Jessen, A)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCREENING ORDER: ORDER for Plaintiff to: (1) Notify the Court that He is Willing to Proceed Only on Certain Claims; (2) File an Amended Complaint; or (3) Notify the Court that He Wishes to Stand on His Complaint Subject to the Court Issuing Findings and Recommendations Consistent With this Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/25/2019. Amended Complaint or Notice due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Eugene C. Brown. (Jessen, A)
May 6, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Second Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment served on Eugene C. Brown. (Jessen, A)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/6/2019. Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
March 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Eugene C. Brown. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP APPLICATION) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Eugene C. Brown (Martin-Gill, S)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY on Sierra Conservation Center: New Case Documents. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *3/18/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 4/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Eugene C. Brown, CDC K-13547 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Eugene C. Brown. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against H.B. Anglea, C. Chothia, M. Crutchfield, M. Gilmore, C. Jukes, L. Kempe, M. Londono, C. Patillo, A. Shaw, J. Walker by Eugene C. Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Brown v. Chothia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Jukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Crutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Patillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Kempe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Londono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Chothia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. Anglea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Artis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.Z. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene C. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?