(HC) Cressler v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Brian Cressler
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 1:2019cv00364
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order on Motion for Extension served on Brian Cressler. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING Respondent's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2019. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 27, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #14 Order on Motion for Extension served on Brian Cressler. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING NUNC PRO TUNC #6 Motion for Extension to File Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/26/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to file response to the petition for writ of habeas corpus by On Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Service)(Hokans, Julie)
June 5, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Brian Cressler. (Marrujo, C)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00364-LJO-JLT. (Marrujo, C)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by On Habeas Corpus. Attorney Hokans, Julie Anne added. (Hokans, Julie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #7 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzen. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONDENT'S ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/1/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Brian Cressler. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/1/2019. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Sant Agata, S)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS by Brian Cressler.(Sant Agata, S)
April 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to File Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Brian Cressler. (Sant Agata, S)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Brian Cressler. (Sant Agata, S)
March 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order, served on Brian Cressler. (Marrujo, C)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Provide Petitioner With Blank Forms for Filing 2241 Habeas Action; ORDER DIRECTING Petitioner to File Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/22/19. Thirty Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 2241 Instructions & Petition)(Marrujo, C)
March 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Brian Cressler. (Marrujo, C)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING In Forma Pauperis Status, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/19. (Marrujo, C)
March 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Brian Cressler. (Marrujo, C)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 2254 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against On Habeas Corpus by Brian Cressler.(Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Cressler v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Represented By: Julie Anne Hokans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian Cressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?