(PC) Cortinas v. Vasquez et al
Plaintiff: Larry William Cortinas
Defendant: Fischer, Vasquez, Washington and McDonald
Case Number: 1:2019cv00367
Filed: March 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Larry William Cortinas. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP APPLICATION) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order served on Larry William Cortinas. (Plummer, M)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 4/22/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Plummer, M)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-0452 KJN) to Fresno (1:19-cv-0367 SKO) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/20/19. (Plummer, M)
March 14, 2019 SERVICE BY EMAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Larry William Cortinas. (Zignago, K.)
March 14, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *3/13/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Zignago, K.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Larry William Cortinas. (Zignago, K.)
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Larry William Cortinas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Cortinas v. Vasquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry William Cortinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?