(PC) Martinez v. Navarro, et al.
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Martinez
Defendant: E. Mares, M. Navarro, Cruz and Navarro
Case Number: 1:2019cv00378
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jose Antonio Martinez. (Marrujo, C)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/20/19. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Marrujo, C)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jose Antonio Martinez. (Sant Agata, S)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jose Antonio Martinez, CDC #J-78494 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Hellings, J)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jose Antonio Martinez. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, served on Jose Antonio Martinez. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Plaintiff to Either: (1) Submit New, Completed Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; OR (2) Pay $400.00 Filing Fee in Full; ORDER for Clerk to Send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/23/2019: 20-Day Deadline. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application - blank form)(Hellings, J)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jose Antonio Martinez. (Hellings, J)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Order to Submit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Jose Antonio Martinez. (Hellings, J)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Jose Antonio Martinez. (Hellings, J)
March 28, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings served on Jose Antonio Martinez. (Hellings, J)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or Pay Filing Fee Within 30 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application - blank form)(Hellings, J)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Corcoran State Prison at COR.filings@cdcr.ca.gov. (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Service Notice issued re complaint filed *3/22/2019*; Consent or Decline due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 E-Service Notice) (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jose Antonio Martinez. (Hellings, J)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Jose Antonio Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Martinez v. Navarro, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Mares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Antonio Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?