(PC) Jones v. Pfeiffer et al
Plaintiff: Dyrell Wayne Jones
Defendant: M. Pitchford, C. Pfeiffer, R. Velasco and J. Walinga
Case Number: 1:2019cv00396
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE to #18 Order by Dyrell Wayne Jones.(Lundstrom, T)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER VACATING June 5, 2019 Findings and Recommendations; SCREENING ORDER; ORDER that Plaintiff: (1) Notify the Court that he is willing to proceed only on the claims sanctioned by this order; (2) File a Second Amended Complaint; (3) Notify the Court that he wishes to stand on his complaint, subject to dismissal of claims and Defendants consistent with the order,signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/26/19. Amended Complaint due 30-Day Deadline (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Form)(Martin-Gill, S) (Main Document 18 replaced on 6/27/2019) (Martin-Gill, S).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Screening Order, served on Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Re-SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Screening Order, served on Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT by Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Gonzalez, R)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ***VACATED PER ORDER #18 ***FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff be Permitted to Proceed on Cognizable Claim and that Non-Cognizable Claims be Dismissed with Leave to Amend re #1 ; ORDER to Assign Case to District Court Judge, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 6/5/19. This case is assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case no. is: 1:19-cv-0396-DAD-JDP. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Findings and Recommendations, served on Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Gonzalez, R)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TERMINATING #11 Motion to Proceed IFP; Previous IFP Granted per #10 Order. (Sant Agata, S)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION /Request for Return of Premature Filed Documents by Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Sant Agata, S)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Sant Agata, S)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Sant Agata, S)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Sant Agata, S)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 04/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Flores, E)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Flores, E)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Flores, E)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Flores, E)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Dyrell Wayne Jones, CDC AU-8248 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Flores, E)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-01075.
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Flores, E)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The Clerk shall transfer the case forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/26/19. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/28/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/28/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 4/8/2019. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/28/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dyrell Wayne Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/28/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against C. Pfeiffer, M. Pitchford, R. Velasco, J. Walinga Filed byDyrell Wayne Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 3/1/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Jones v. Pfeiffer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Pitchford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfeiffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Velasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Walinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyrell Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?