Central Valley Medical Group, Inc. v. Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Central Valley Medical Group, Inc.
Defendant: Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00404
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc. by Central Valley Medical Group, Inc..(Hernandez, Krista)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #6 Motion to Remand, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 6/14/19. (Marrujo, C)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE MANDATORY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 6/25/2019 to 8/6/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/11/2019. (Kusamura, W)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc.. (Cooper, James)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/7/19. Added attorney Michael M. Amir for Central Valley Medical Group, Inc. (Gonzalez, R)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/7/19. Added attorney Krista Leigh Hernandez for Central Valley Medical Group, Inc., attorney Sheila M. Tatayon terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
June 6, 2019 Filing 15 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Central Valley Medical Group, Inc.. (Hernandez, Krista)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Central Valley Medical Group, Inc.. (Amir, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has determined that the motion to dismiss #7 is amenable to decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). The hearing on that motion, currently set for May 14, 2019, is therefore VACATED. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of this Court's heavy caseload signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on May 8, 2019. (Munoz, I)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc. re #11 Opposition to Motion, #7 MOTION to DISMISS. (Cooper, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Central Valley Medical Group, Inc. to #7 MOTION to DISMISS. Attorney Tatayon, Sheila M. added. (Tatayon, Sheila)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has determined that the motion to remand #6 is amenable to decision on the papers pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). The hearing on that motion, currently set for May 6, 2019, is therefore VACATED. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of this Court's heavy caseload. Upon expiration of the reply deadline related to the pending motion to dismiss #7 , the Court will likewise examine the papers to determine whether a hearing on that motion will be needed signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on April 29, 2019. (Munoz, I)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY by Central Valley Medical Group, Inc. re #6 MOTION to REMAND . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of McClelland)(McClelland, Michael)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc. to #6 MOTION to REMAND . (Cooper, James)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooper, James)
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to REMAND by Central Valley Medical Group, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(McClelland, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Central Valley Medical Group, Inc.. (McClelland, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc.. (Cooper, James)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 27, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8182736. (Cooper, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc., dba AllCare IPA. (Cooper, James)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus Superior Court, case number CV-19-001652 by Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc., dba AllCare IPA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Cooper, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Valley Medical Group, Inc. v. Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Physician Associates Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: James Maxwell Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Valley Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. McClelland
Represented By: Michael M. Amir
Represented By: Sheila M. Tatayon
Represented By: Krista Leigh Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?