(PC) Chavez v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Jose Chavez
Defendant: C. Pfieffer, R. Magana, L. Moreno, Scott Kernan, J Palomino, M. Franco, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., A. Sotelo, D. Williams, M. Faulkner, J. Lara and H. Robles
Case Number: 1:2019cv00410
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Jose Chavez. (Jessen, A)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion). (Jessen, A)
April 2, 2019 Filing 14 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Jose Chavez (Martin-Gill, S)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Jose Chavez, CDC AD-5110 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Jessen, A)
March 29, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Jose Chavez. (Jessen, A)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:18-cv-07049.
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/28/2019. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/29/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tshS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE, Declaration, Affidavit in Support of In Forma Pauperis by Jose Chavez re #8 Order Granting Request for Extension to Complete In Forma Pauperis, Set/Reset Deadlines for Pro Se Prisoner Cases, (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPELTE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION re #7 Letter filed by Jose Chavez.Certificate due by 2/28/2019.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Letter asking for 30-60 day extension to obtain trust account information from Jose Chavez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE COMPLETE IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION. IFP Forms due by 2/6/2019.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2019) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose Chavez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jose Chavez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 1/4/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jose Chavez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018) [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edmond G. Brown, Jr, M. Faulkner, M. Franco, Scott Kernan, J. Lara, R. Magana, L Moreno, J Palomino, C. Pfieffer, H Robles, A. Sotelo, D. Williams. Filed byJose Chavez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service, #3 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/27/2018: #4 Cover Letter by Anthony R. Turner) (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 3/29/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Chavez v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Pfieffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Magana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Moreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Palomino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Sotelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?