Farmer v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Stacy Farmer
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00413
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc. 19) indicating that settlement has been reach with Defendant Trans Union LLC. Pursuant to this Court's Local Rule 160, this Court ORDERS Plaintiff and Defendant Trans Union LLC, no later than September 10, 2019, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action as to Defendant Trans Union LLC. All pending dates and filing deadlines pertaining to Defendant Trans Union LLC are VACATED. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on counsel or parties who contributed to violation of this order. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/11/2019. (Gonzales, V)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT Between Plaintiff and only Defendant Trans Union LLC by Stacy Farmer. (Ovruchesky, Clark)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Settlement (Doc. #17 ) indicating that settlement has been reached with Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. only. Pursuant to this Court's Local Rule 160, this Court ORDERS Plaintiff, no later than August 19, 2019, to file appropriate papers to dismiss or conclude this action as to Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. All pending dates and filing deadlines pertaining to Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. only are VACATED. Failure to comply with this order may be grounds for the imposition of sanctions on counsel or parties who contributed to violation of this order. See Local Rule 160 and Local Rule 272. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2019. (Valdez, E)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT Between Plaintiff and only Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. by Stacy Farmer. (Ovruchesky, Clark)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER by Trans Union LLC.(Brady, Scott)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the press of business, the Scheduling Conference is continued from 7/3/2019 to September 10, 2019 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc. #3 ), one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Parties wishing to appear telephonically may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/3/2019.(Valdez, E)
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Ryan Ho Wai Chan for Experian Information Solutions, Inc., attorney Donna Woo terminated (Chan, Ryan)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL COMPLAINT signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/20/2019. (It is hereby ordered that defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. shall have until June 21, 2019 to answer plaintiffs complaint.)(Thorp, J)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Second Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. to Respond to Initial Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/17/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond To Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dailey, Steven)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Woo, Donna)
April 26, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Woo, Donna added.(Woo, Donna)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. Attorney Dailey, Steven M. added. (Dailey, Steven)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/16/19. Added attorney Scott E. Brady, PHV for Trans Union LLC.. (Marrujo, C)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
April 12, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Trans Union LLC for attorney Scott E. Brady to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8209120) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Booth, Eileen)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT Only) Parties wishing to appear telephonically at the Scheduling Conference currently set for Wednesday, July 3, 2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe may do so with each party using the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/1/2019. (Valdez, E)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/3/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 DAD Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Hellings, J)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., Trans Union LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Clark Ovruchesky* *C.O. Law, APC* *2404 Broadway, Suite 150* *San Diego, CA 92102*. (Hellings, J)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Stacy Farmer. Attorney Ovruchesky, Clark added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8187804) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ovruchesky, Clark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farmer v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Dailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Ho Wai Chan
Represented By: Donna Woo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Brady, PHV
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Farmer
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?