Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC v. Laborers International Union of North America Local 220 et al

Plaintiff: Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC
Defendant: Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Southern California District Council of Laborers, Sergio Rascon, Alexander B. Cvitan and Jon P. Preciado
Case Number: 1:2019cv00416
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint; Proposed Briefing Schedule for Responsive Motions; and Continuance of Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Alexander B. Cvitan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Jon P. Preciado, Sergio Rascon, Southern California District Council of Laborers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint and Proposed Briefing Schedule for Responsive Motions; and Continuance of Mandatory Scheduling Conference)(Zakson, Laurence)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) In light of the filing as of right pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) of a first amended complaint #21 , the pending motions to dismiss #13 #16 are denied as moot and without prejudice to their renewal, as appropriate, as to the amended pleading. The hearing on those motions, currently set for July 25, 2019, is VACATED signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on July 11, 2019. (Munoz, I)
July 8, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC.(Vaudreuil, Courtney)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Richard Drury in support of #16 MOTION to DISMISS, #13 MOTION to DISMISS. (Zakson, Laurence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Alexander B. Cvitan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Jon P. Preciado, Sergio Rascon, Southern California District Council of Laborers in re #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #13 Motion to Dismiss, #15 Proposed Order, #16 Motion to Dismiss, #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #18 Proposed Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10)(Zakson, Laurence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED ORDER re Individual Defs' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Strike and Joinder in Union Entity Defs' Motion re #16 MOTION to DISMISS, #17 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Zakson, Laurence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Alexander B. Cvitan, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Jon P. Preciado, Sergio Rascon in SUPPORT of #16 MOTION to DISMISS. (Zakson, Laurence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS by Alexander B. Cvitan, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Jon P. Preciado, Sergio Rascon. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Zakson, Laurence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER re Union EntityDefendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Jurisdiction and to Strike re #14 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #13 MOTION to DISMISS. (Zakson, Laurence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM by Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Southern California District Council of Laborers in SUPPORT of #13 MOTION to DISMISS. (Zakson, Laurence)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to DISMISS by Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Southern California District Council of Laborers. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Zakson, Laurence)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The Court is in receipt of the Withdrawal of Kate Spelman as Counsel of Record for Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC (Doc. #11 ) filed on June 3, 2019. Good cause appearing pursuant to E.D. Cal. Local Rule 182(d), and because the withdrawal will not leave Plaintiff in propia persona, the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to RELIEVE attorney Kate Tainsky Spelman of the law firm of Roll Law Group, P.C. as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/4/2019. (Kusamura, W)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY by Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC. (Spelman, Kate)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence on behalf of Alexander B. Cvitan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Jon P. Preciado, Sergio Rascon, Southern California District Council of Laborers. Attorney Lawrence, Aaron Gibran Haq added. (Lawrence, Aaron)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by William Yuan-Wen Sheh on behalf of Alexander B. Cvitan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Jon P. Preciado, Sergio Rascon, Southern California District Council of Laborers. Attorney Sheh, William Yuan-Wen added. (Sheh, William)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED EX PARTE APPLICATION to CONTINUE the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 6/25/2019 to 9/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/15/2019. (Kusamura, W)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Courtney Elena Vaudreuil on behalf of Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC. Attorney Vaudreuil, Courtney Elena added. (Vaudreuil, Courtney)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Alexander B. Cvitan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Jon P. Preciado, Sergio Rascon, Southern California District Council of Laborers for Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Rule 26 Conference and for Scheduling of Status Conference; Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Attorney Zakson, Laurence S. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laurence S. Zakson in support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Continuance of rule 26 Conference and for Scheduling of Status Conference, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zakson, Laurence)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to All Defendants (Spelman, Kate)
April 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kate Tainsky Spelman on behalf of Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC. Attorney Spelman, Kate Tainsky added. (Spelman, Kate)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2019 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Flores, E)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Alexander B. Cvitan, Laborers International Union of North America Local 220, Ernesto J. Ordonez, Jon P. Preciado, Sergio Rascon, Southern California District Council of Laborers* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kristina Maria Diaz* *Roll Law Group, PC* *11444 West Olympic Boulevard, 10th Floor* *Los Angeles, CA 90064*. (Flores, E)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC. Attorney Diaz, Kristina Maria added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8187396) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice 7.1 Disclosure Statement)(Diaz, Kristina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC v. Laborers International Union of North America Local 220 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laborers International Union of North America Local 220
Represented By: Laurence S. Zakson
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: William Yuan-Wen Sheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernesto J. Ordonez
Represented By: Laurence S. Zakson
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: William Yuan-Wen Sheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California District Council of Laborers
Represented By: Laurence S. Zakson
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: William Yuan-Wen Sheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Rascon
Represented By: Laurence S. Zakson
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: William Yuan-Wen Sheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander B. Cvitan
Represented By: Laurence S. Zakson
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: William Yuan-Wen Sheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon P. Preciado
Represented By: Laurence S. Zakson
Represented By: Aaron Gibran Haq Lawrence
Represented By: William Yuan-Wen Sheh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wonderful Real Estate Development LLC
Represented By: Kristina Maria Diaz
Represented By: Kate Tainsky Spelman
Represented By: Courtney Elena Vaudreuil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?