H. et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: F. H., C. H., Karla Monserrat Diaz Hernandez and Noe Hurtado
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00435
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING a continuance of the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 7/18/2019 and CONTINUING it to 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/12/2019. (Rooney, M)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER re Continuing Mandatory Scheduling Conference by C. H., F. H., Karla Monserrat Diaz Hernandez, Noe Hurtado. (Baradat, Daniel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Kevin B. Kalajian. (Baradat, Daniel)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Noe Hurtado, C. H., Karla Monserrat Diaz Hernandez, F. H.. United States of America served on 4/15/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Baradat, Daniel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by C. H., F. H., Karla Monserrat Diaz Hernandez, Noe Hurtado. (Baradat, Daniel)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Daniel R. Baradat* *Baradat & Paboojian, Inc.* *720 West Alluvial Avenue* *Fresno, CA 93711*. (Gonzalez, R)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against the United States of America by Noe Hurtado, C. H., Karla Monserrat Diaz Hernandez, F. H.. Attorney Baradat, Daniel R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8197273) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet)(Baradat, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: H. et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. H.
Represented By: Daniel R. Baradat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. H.
Represented By: Daniel R. Baradat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla Monserrat Diaz Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel R. Baradat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noe Hurtado
Represented By: Daniel R. Baradat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?