(PC) Washington v. Fresno County Sheriff, et al.
Plaintiff: Perry Washington
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff and Sgt. Rodolfo Diaz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00478
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Perry Washington. (Gonzalez, R)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Disregarding #9 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/25/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Perry Washington. (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE/CIVIL COVER SHEET as to #1 by Perry Washington. (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Perry Washington. (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00478 AWI JLT (PC). (Hellings, J)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Perry Washington. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Perry Washington. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP #4 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/23/2019. (Hellings, J)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Perry Washington. (Hellings, J)
April 22, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Perry Washington. (Lundstrom, T)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to submit Application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay filing fee within 21-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
April 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Perry Washington. (Hellings, J)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Hellings, J)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Perry Washington.(Hellings, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Washington v. Fresno County Sheriff, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Rodolfo Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?