(HC) McBride v. Shinn

Petitioner: Randall McBride
Respondent: D. Shinn
Case Number: 1:2019cv00482
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SECOND ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/2/2019. Respondent's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
June 17, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Move This Honorable Court to Proceed in Addressing the Merits of Petitioner's Habeas Corpus Filed July 23, 2018 Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 by Randall McBride. (Jessen, A)
May 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE Adoption of Response and Motion to Dismiss, ECF 10 by D. Shinn re #20 Order Re Consent or Request for Reassignment. Attorney Rodriguez, Michelle added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1)(Rodriguez, Michelle)
April 24, 2019 Filing 21 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Randall McBride. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 18, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #19 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition, served on Randall McBride. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT for Respondents, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/18/19. Consent or Decline due by 5/23/2019 (Martin-Gill, S)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/17/19. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019(Martin-Gill, S)
April 15, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #18 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Randall McBride. (Jessen, A)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Randall McBride signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/15/2019. (Jessen, A)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
April 15, 2019 Filing 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 5:18-cv-01634.
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald transferring case to Eastern District of California. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. (see attached order) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jm) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. (jm) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of California filed by Petitioner Randall McBride. (jm) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SUA SPONTE EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. The Court sua sponte extends the deadline for Petitioner to file his opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss to March 20, 2019. (see document for details) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PETITIONER'S REQUEST THAT THE COURT DISMISS RESPONDENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: denying #11 REQUEST to Dismiss: Petitioner argues that Respondent failed to comply with this Court's order setting the January 31, 2019, deadline to respond. However, the Court's docket indicates that Respondent's motion to dismiss was filed on January 31, 2019. (Docket No. 10.) Therefore, Petitioner's request is DENIED. Petitioner is reminded that his opposition, if any, to the motion to dismiss is due no later than February 20, 2019. (jm) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST that this Court dismiss the government's ex parte application for an extension of time filed by Petitioner Randall McBride. (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Respondent D. Shinn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Yanniello, Ian) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 #8 by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm: The government shall file its response by January 31, 2019. (see order for details) (hr) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File GOVERNMENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. SECTION 2241; DECLARATION OF IAN V. YANNIELLO filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, RESPONDENT D. Shinn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Yanniello, Ian) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of Assistant United States Attorney on behalf of Respondent D. Shinn. Assistant United States Attorney Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV and US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit terminated. (Attorney Ian Yanniello added to party D. Shinn(pty:res))(Yanniello, Ian) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO PETITION (FEDERAL CUSTODY) by Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. Respondent D. Shinn file Answer to the Petition not later than 12/6/2018 or a Motion to Dismiss shall be filed by 11/21/2018. (see order for further details). Notice: Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (hr) Modified on 10/23/2018 (hr). [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of address changing attorney's address to FCI Mendota, PO Box 9, Mendota CA 93640. Filed by Petitioner Randall McBride. (jm) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-38) (ghap) [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
August 2, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Order, Case Transferred Out to Another District served on Randall McBride. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/3/2018.] [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER CASE TRANSFERRED to the Central District of California signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/2/2018. Case Closed. (Lundstrom, T) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/3/2018.] [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against D. Shinn by Randall McBride.(Hellings, J) [Transferred from California Eastern on 8/3/2018.] [Transferred from cacd on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) McBride v. Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D. Shinn
Represented By: Ian Yanniello
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Represented By: Michelle Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randall McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?