(PC) Hammler v. Kernan et al

Case Number: 1:2019cv00497
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Reconsideration, DENYING Motion to be Exempt Form the Twenty-Five Page Limit, and Granting Extension of Time to File a First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/20/19. (Marrujo, C)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Striking 24 First Amended Complaint as Violation of Court's May 8, 2019 Order, with Leave to Amend, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/5/19. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action - CASE ASSIGNED to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. New Case No. 1:19-cv-00497 DAD SAB (PC); FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 10 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/24/2019: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-0468 CKD) to Fresno (1:19-cv-0497 SAB) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/17/2019. (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hammler v. Kernan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?