(SS) Thor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Cha Xiong Thor
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00503
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Timothy Bolin, GOVT for Commissioner of Social Security, attorney Beatrice Na terminated (Bolin, Timothy)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Na, Beatrice added. (Na, Beatrice)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cha Xiong Thor. (Holmberg, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Cha Xiong Thor. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/7/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holmberg, Matthew)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Matthew Franklin Holmberg* *Law Offices of Lawrence D. Rohlfing* *12631 E. Imperial Highway, Suite C-115* *Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670*. (Lundstrom, T)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions). (Lundstrom, T)
April 18, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Sant Agata, S)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Cha Xiong Thor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holmberg, Matthew)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT For Review of The Final Decision Of The Social Security against Nancy A Berryhill by Cha Xiong Thor. (Attachments: #1 Certification Of Interested Parties, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holmberg, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Thor v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Beatrice Na
Represented By: Timothy Bolin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cha Xiong Thor
Represented By: Matthew Franklin Holmberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?