(PC) Hunt v. Diaz et al

Case Number: 1:2019cv00504
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that the instant action be dismissed for failure to prosecute ; referred to Judge Drozd; New case number is 1:19-cv-00504 SAB (PC), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/27/2019. Objections to F&R due 14-Day Deadline(Martin-Gill, S)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/3/19. Show Cause Response Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-0543 DMC) to Fresno (1:19-cv-0504 SAB) signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/19/2019. (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Hunt v. Diaz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?