(SS) Moua v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Za Xiong Moua
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00516
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/26/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Jessen, A)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Branick-Abilla, Margaret added. (Branick-Abilla, Margaret)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Za Xiong Moua pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Za Xiong Moua. (Pena, Jonathan)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 7/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM-285 Forms) (Flores, E)
April 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Flores, E)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 04/23/2019. (Flores, E)
April 22, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Za Xiong Moua. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion)(Pena, Jonathan)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Za Xiong Moua. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Moua v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Margaret Branick-Abilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Za Xiong Moua
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?