Null v. Leprino Foods Company et al
Plaintiff: Donald Null
Defendant: Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company and Leprino Foods Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00525
Filed: April 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
2 Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
3 Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Eric Daniel Rouen on behalf of Donald Null. Attorney Rouen, Eric Daniel added. (Rouen, Eric)
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Amanda M. Osowski on behalf of Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company. Attorney Osowski, Amanda M. added. (Osowski, Amanda)
June 19, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Donald Null in SUPPORT of #8 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Szeto, Kitty Kit)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) The Court has deemed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND Doc. No. #8 and MOTION FOR JUDGMENT Doc. No. #9 , noticed for hearing on 6/17/2019, before Senior District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, suitable for decision WITHOUT oral argument pursuant to Local Rule 230(g). As such, the hearing on same is VACATED and the matter will be taken under submission as of that date. Minute order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/12/2019. (Gonzales, V)
June 10, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY by Donald Null re #8 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. (Crist, Ryan)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY by Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company re #9 MOTION for JUDGMENT Defendant Leprino Foods Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Pooley, Lisa)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 OPPOSITION by Donald Null to #9 MOTION for JUDGMENT Defendant Leprino Foods Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Szeto, Kitty Kit)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company to #8 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend)(Pooley, Lisa)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) signed by Senior District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/17/2019. The Motion To Amend #8 Hearing currently set for 06/17/2019 before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe is RESET for 06/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Senior District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Gonzales, V).
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER re Judgment on the Pleadings re #11 Request for Judicial Notice, #9 MOTION for JUDGMENT Defendant Leprino Foods Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company. (Pooley, Lisa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company in re #9 Motion for Judgment, #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Pooley, Lisa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company in SUPPORT of #9 MOTION for JUDGMENT Defendant Leprino Foods Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Pooley, Lisa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for JUDGMENT Defendant Leprino Foods Company's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Pooley, Lisa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend by Donald Null. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF RYAN A. CRIST IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, #3 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND)(Crist, Ryan)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On May 2, 2019 the Court filed an Order Relating and Reassigning Case (Doc. #6 ). Due to reassignment of the case, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE current set for June 18, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone is RESET to July 16, 2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Judge McAuliffe. A JOINT Scheduling Conference Report, carefully prepared and executed by all counsel, shall be electronically filed in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (see attached), one (1) full week prior to the Scheduling Conference, and a copy shall be e-mailed, in Word format, to bamorders@caed.uscourts.gov. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00525-AWI-BAM, to be used on all future filings. The parties wishing to appear telephonically for said hearing, may do so with each partyusing the following dial-in number and passcode: dial-in number 1-877-411-9748; passcode 3190866. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/3/2019. (Valdez, E)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Relating and REASSIGNING CASE to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe for all further proceedings signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/01/2019. New Case Number: 1:19-cv-525 AWI-BAM.(Flores, E)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 1:13-cv-02059, 1:17-cv-00686 by Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company. (Rappaport, Sandra)
April 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Defendants' Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice to Adverse Party and to State Court of Removal of Action to Federal Court by Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Pooley, Lisa)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R)
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendants Leprino Foods Company, Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company. (Pooley, Lisa)
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kings County Superior Court, case number 19C-0104 by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pooley, Lisa)
April 23, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8224105. (Pooley, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Null v. Leprino Foods Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leprino Foods Dairy Products Company
Represented By: Molly L. Kaban
Represented By: Sandra L. Rappaport
Represented By: Lisa M. Pooley
Represented By: Amanda M. Osowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leprino Foods Company
Represented By: Molly L. Kaban
Represented By: Sandra L. Rappaport
Represented By: Lisa M. Pooley
Represented By: Amanda M. Osowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Null
Represented By: Kitty Kit Yee Szeto
Represented By: John M Bickford
Represented By: R Rex Parris
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Crist
Represented By: Eric Daniel Rouen
Represented By: Ryan Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?