(HC)Langley v. On Habeas Corpus
Petitioner: Randy Langley
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Case Number: 1:2019cv00547
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENT(S) ELECTRONICALLY by On Habeas Corpus: in Support of Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 LD 1, #2 LD 2, #3 LD 3, #4 LD 4, #5 LD 5, #6 LD 6, #7 LD 7, #8 LD 8, #9 LD 9, #10 LD 10, #11 Proof of Service)(Firestone, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to DISMISS by On Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Firestone, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00547-DAD-EPG(HC). (Sant Agata, S)
June 24, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Randy Langley. (Sant Agata, S)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by On Habeas Corpus. Attorney Firestone, Jeffrey D. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Firestone, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Randy Langley. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzen. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RESPONDENT'S ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/1/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/1/2019. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Randy Langley. (Sant Agata, S)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Sant Agata, S)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Randy Langley signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/30/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
April 30, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Randy Langley. (Sant Agata, S)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Randy Langley. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC)Langley v. On Habeas Corpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Randy Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: On Habeas Corpus
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Firestone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?