(SS) Bridges v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Marvin Bridges
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00564
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/1/2019, answer due 8/30/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Marriott, Michael K. added. (Marriott, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by James Marvin Bridges. (Pena, Jonathan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by James Marvin Bridges pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 8/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Consent, #3 USM-285 Forms) (Flores, E)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *93721*. (Flores, E)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #4 Amended Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 05/23/2019. (Flores, E)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS amending #2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Marvin Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to AMEND Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; Twenty-One Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2019 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Sant Agata, S)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Bridges. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion)(Pena, Jonathan)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by James Bridges. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Bridges v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Michael K. Marriott, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Marvin Bridges
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?