(HC) Sonny D. Barger v. California
Petitioner: Sonny D. Barger, II and Gary Francis Fisher
Respondent: California
Case Number: 1:2019cv00577
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Sonny D. Barger, II. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #8 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Sonny D. Barger II. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Sonny D.Barger; GRANTING #7 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/16/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Sonny D. Barger, II. (Gonzalez, R)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-02177.
April 30, 2019 The United States District Court for the Eastern District of California shall receive the contact information from this Court via e-mail/telephone transfer. Re #5 Order of Transfer (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/2/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 04/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/2/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 5/31/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/2/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR COUNSEL; by Sonny D. Barger, II. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/2/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FEE WAIVER; by Sonny D. Barger, II. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/2/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING). Filed bySonny D. Barger, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Sonny D. Barger v. California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sonny D. Barger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?