(HC) Hand v. Puentes
Petitioner: Jehu Hand
Respondent: Georgina Puentes
Case Number: 1:2019cv00631
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jeremy D Peterson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 OBJECTIONS to FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS #5 by Petitioner Jehu Hand. (Lundstrom, T)
May 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Findings and Recommendations served on Jehu Hand. (Jessen, A)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Forward Copy of Order to Counsel; ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Court Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. #1 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/14/2019. This case has been assigned to District Judge Dale A. Drozd and Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. The new case number is 1:19-cv-00631-DAD-JDP (HC). Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
May 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Jehu Hand. (Jessen, A)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Jehu Hand re #2 signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 5/10/2019. (Jessen, A)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Petitioner's Consent or Decline due within thirty (30) days. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Jessen, A)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Jehu Hand. (Jessen, A)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 (2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Georgina Puentes by Jehu Hand. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Hand v. Puentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jehu Hand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Georgina Puentes
Represented By: Dale Patrick
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: US Attorney's Office- 2241 Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?