(HC) Lopez v. Sherman

Petitioner: Israel Lopez
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00643
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Israel Lopez. (Jessen, A)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00643-LJO-JLT (HC). (Jessen, A)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Stu Sherman. Attorney Indermill, Darren Kyle added. (Indermill, Darren)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Israel Lopez. (Marrujo, C)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzen. (Sant Agata, S)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONDENT'S ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/17/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Israel Lopez. (Sant Agata, S)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/17/2019. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General.(Sant Agata, S)
May 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Authorizing IFP Status, served on Israel Lopez. (Gonzalez, R)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Israel Lopez, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/14/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 14, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order served on Israel Lopez. (Plummer, M)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Plummer, M)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:19-cv-0825 AC) to Fresno (1:19-cv-643 JLT) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/13/19. (Plummer, M)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Israel Lopez. (Sant Agata, S)
May 13, 2019 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Israel Lopez, CDCR# AY-4707 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
May 10, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Israel Lopez. (York, M)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED: Consent or Decline due by 6/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (York, M)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Israel Lopez. (York, M)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Stu Sherman. (York, M) Modified on 5/13/2019 (Yin, K).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Lopez v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Israel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Stu Sherman
Represented By: Darren Kyle Indermill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?