(HC) Oquita v. Diaz
Petitioner: Javier Romero Oquita
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00670
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. (Oleksa, Jennifer)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ralph Diaz. (Oleksa, Jennifer)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Jennifer Oleksa re #10 Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge: Your filing is entitled Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, however, the actual document attached is a Certificate of Service. Please re-fileyour document using the correct event. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to theCM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Sant Agata, S)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Ralph Diaz. Attorney Oleksa, Jennifer added. (Oleksa, Jennifer)
June 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Javier Romero Oquita. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Anthony W. Ishii and Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00670 AWI-SAB (HC). (Martin-Gill, S)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Javier Romero Oquita. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 28, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Directing Respondent to File a Response to the Petition served on Javier Romero Oquita. (Jessen, A)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 DOCUMENT SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus served on Tami Krenzin, Attorney General's Office. (Jessen, A)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition and to Electronically File Transcripts and Other Necessary Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/28/2019. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Jessen, A)
May 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #4 Order Authorizing IFP Status, Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Javier Romero Oquita. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Javier R. Oquita; GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 (NOT SIGNED) DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Javier Romero Oquita. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Javier Romero Oquita. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against Ralph Diaz by Javier Romero Oquita.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Oquita v. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Romero Oquita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph Diaz
Represented By: Jennifer Oleksa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?