(PC) Solorio v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Solorio
Defendant: I Ottsman, W Sullivan, Gratokoski, Clayton, V Chavez, Lt Cardenas, S Jeffrey, E Barthelmes and R Caldron
Case Number: 1:2019cv00688
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP APPLICATION) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Adrian Solorio. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Adrian Solorio. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Adrian Solorio. (Marrujo, C)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER to Submit New Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis or Pay $400.00 Filing Fee within 30 Days,signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/23/2019. ( Motion for IFP due 30-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 IFP APPLICATION)(Martin-Gill, S)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order, served on Adrian Solorio. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Adrian Solorio (Martin-Gill, S)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Adrian Solorio, CDC AA-3613 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Marrujo, C)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-02350.
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Adrian Solorio. (Marrujo, C)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019) [Transferred from cand on 5/20/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 6/7/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/20/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/20/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Adrian Solorio. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/20/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and A Temporary Restraining Order re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Adrian Solorio. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/20/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Adrian Solorio. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/20/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against E Barthelmes, Cardenas, V Chavez, Clayton, Gratokoski, I Ottsman, W. Sullivan. Filed by Adrian Solorio. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/2/2019: #1 Envelope) (jmlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 5/20/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Solorio v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I Ottsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gratokoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Cardenas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Barthelmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Caldron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Solorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?