John Dovichi v. California Department of Motor Vehicles et al
Plaintiff: John Dovichi
Defendant: California Department of Motor Vehicles and Robert Venable
Case Number: 1:2019cv00725
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Robert Venable served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Whittington, Mark)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: California Department of Motor Vehicles served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. (Whittington, Mark)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *California Department of Motor Vehicles, Robert Venable* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joel T Andreesen* *Rodriguez & Associates* *2020 Eye Street* *Bakersfield, CA 93301*. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 23, 2019 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-8278004. (Rojas-Iniguez, Danay)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Dovichi. Attorney Rojas-Iniguez, Danay Sade added. (Rojas-Iniguez, Danay)
May 22, 2019 PAYMENT for miscellaneous case filing fee in the amount of $ 47, receipt number 0972-8277480. (Rojas-Iniguez, Danay) Erroneously paid the miscellaneous fee instead of Civil Filing Fee; refunded receipt 0972-8277480 Modified on 5/23/2019 (Woodson, A).
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by John Dovichi (Rojas-Iniguez, Danay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Dovichi v. California Department of Motor Vehicles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Venable
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dovichi
Represented By: Daniel Walter Turek
Represented By: Joel T Andreesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?