Hammami v. Mcaleenan et al
Plaintiff: Mohhamed Mokhar Hammami
Defendant: Kevin Mc Aleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv00741
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Barr. (Hemesath, Audrey)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #5 Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge: Per Attorney Hemesath's Office, Consent was filed in Error, correct filing to follow. (Gonzalez, R)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 ***Disregard, Filed in Error*** CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by William Barr. (Hemesath, Audrey)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Audrey Benison Hemesath for William Barr (Hemesath, Audrey)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *William Barr, Kevin Mc Aleenan* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *James Martin Makasian* *A Professional Corporation* *1327 "N" Street* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Lundstrom, T)
May 29, 2019 RECEIPT number #CAE100042594 $400.00 fbo Mohhamed M. Hammami by James M. Makasian on 5/28/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kevin McAleenan and William Barr by Mohhamed Mokhar Hammami. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammami v. Mcaleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Mc Aleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohhamed Mokhar Hammami
Represented By: James Martin Makasian
Represented By: Steven P. Simonian, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?