(PC) Willis v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Kentrell Willis
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv00761
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Lawrence J O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Kentrell Willis and USP Lewisburg. (Jessen, A)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion). (Jessen, A)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kentrell Willis. (Jessen, A)
June 17, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: 9 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case served on Kentrell Willis. (Jessen, A)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY): Pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill and Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The new case number is: 1:19-cv-00761-LJO-BAM (PC). (Jessen, A)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kentrell Willis. (Jessen, A)
June 4, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Kentrell Willis. (Lundstrom, T)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/4/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying In Forma Pauperis Application without prejudice #2 and to submit Prisoner Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis or pay filing fee within 30-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
May 31, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kentrell Willis. (Lundstrom, T)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by Kentrell Willis. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Kentrell Willis. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Kentrell Willis. (Lundstrom, T)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against United States of America by Kentrell Willis.(Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Willis v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentrell Willis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?